This printed article is located at https://investor.perennialholdings.com/news.html
Announcement Title | Change - Announcement of Cessation |
Date & Time of Broadcast | Feb 27, 2019 17:13 |
Status | New |
Announcement Sub Title | Cessation of Group COO, Perennial Real Estate Holdings Limited and CEO, Perennial Healthcare |
Announcement Reference | SG190227OTHRY6RB |
Submitted By (Co./ Ind. Name) | Sim Ai Hua |
Designation | Company Secretary |
Description (Please provide a detailed description of the event in the box below) | Cessation of Group Chief Operating Officer, Perennial Real Estate Holdings Limited and Chief Executive Officer, Perennial Healthcare Pte. Ltd. ("Perennial Healthcare") |
Additional Details | |
Name Of Person | Liak Teng Lit |
Age | 65 |
Is effective date of cessation known? | Yes |
If yes, please provide the date | 01/03/2019 |
Detailed Reason (s) for cessation | To devote more time to serve in his various roles in the public, private and people sectors. Mr Liak will be appointed as Advisor of Perennial Healthcare with effect from 1 March 2019. |
Are there any unresolved differences in opinion on material matters between the person and the board of directors, including matters which would have a material impact on the group or its financial reporting? | No |
Is there any matter in relation to the cessation that needs to be brought to the attention of the shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
Any other relevant information to be provided to shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
Date of Appointment to current position | 06/03/2017 |
Does the AC have a minimum of 3 members (taking into account this cessation)? | Yes |
Number of Independent Directors currently resident in Singapore (taking into account this cessation) | 4 |
Number of cessations of appointments specified in Listing Rule 704 (7) or Catalist Rule 704 (6) over the past 12 months | 0 |
Job Title (e.g. Lead ID, AC Chairman, AC Member etc.) | Group Chief Operating Officer, Perennial Real Estate Holdings Limited and Chief Executive Officer, Perennial Healthcare Pte. Ltd. |
Role and responsibilities | As Group Chief Operating Officer, Mr Liak assists Mr Pua Seck Guan, Chief Executive Officer ("CEO") of Perennial Real Estate Holdings Limited ("Perennial"), to oversee and manage the general business of Perennial. As CEO of Perennial Healthcare Pte. Ltd., Mr Liak assists Mr Pua to provide strategic leadership in the development and management of Perennial's healthcare businesses in Singapore and China. |
Familial relationship with any director and/ or substantial shareholder of the listed issuer or of any of its principal subsidiaries | Nil. |
Shareholding interest in the listed issuer and its subsidiaries? | No |
Past (for the last 5 years) | See Appendix 2 |
Present | See Appendix 1 |
Attachments